This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:11:22 (UTC).

Lex Barber vs Linear Options, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Lex Barber filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Linear Options, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1863

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barber, Lex

Defendants

Galeb Paving, Inc.

Wilson, Charles

Linear Options, Inc.

Galeb, Slobodan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kaufmann, Aaron David

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas, Mollie Michelle

Robertson, Stephen Wilson

Nowland, Thomas F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Order - Comment: Notice: Entry of Order Granting Motion to be Relived as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Order: Motion to be relieved as counsel - Comment: Hrg 7-23-19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: MTn to be relieved as counsel for Charles Wilson (Thomas Nowland) April 949-221-0005) 5/13/19rb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Motion: Withdraw as attorney - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: for Def. Linear Options, Inc. (Thomas Nowland)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Motion: Withdraw as attorney - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: for Slobodan Galeb (Thomas Nowland)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Motion: Withdraw as attorney - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: for Galeb Paving, Inc. (Thomas Nowland)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: OLD: Atty Nowland, NEW: Atty Burks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: OLD: Atty Nowland, NEW: Atty Burks

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2018
  • Notice of Hearing (no fee) - Comment: Demurrer; 6/12/18; 9 AM; D19; Atty Nowland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: of Sarah K. Simon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: Taken on Demurrer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less