This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:32:00 (UTC).

Leslie Boyle vs Rekha Pai et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Leslie Boyle filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rekha Pai. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1867

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boyle, Leslie

Defendants

Pai, Rekha

Kamath, Anil

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Friel, Lance Val

Defendant Attorney

Rendler, Devereaux

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: No special or telephonic appearances for Plt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Demand: Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Rendler

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Defendant Rekha Pai

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Defendant Anil Kamath

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Response/Reply - Comment: Response to Order to Show Cause re Failure to Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less