This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 14:20:12 (UTC).

Leonicio Esquivel et al vs Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2016 Leonicio Esquivel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Aramark Uniform Career Apparel Group, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E, Stoelker, James L, Pierce, Mark H and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0380

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Stoelker, James L

Pierce, Mark H

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Esquivel, Leonicio

Cervantes, Maria Alejo

Defendants

Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group, Inc.

Red Star Industrial Service

Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC

Aramark Services, Inc.

Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group, Inc

Aramark Corporation

Aramark Services, Inc

Schamas Mfg. Co.

Central Coast Construction

Ryco Conveyors, Inc.

Conquest Conveyor Corporation

Aramark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leary, Elinor

Defendant Attorneys

Edson, Cherie Jean

Cummings, Sasha M

Hoffman, Thomas Oliver

Henning, Jack Christopher

Shine, Zachary W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Comment: PARTIAL w/o prej as to the Cross-Complaint of Ryco Conveyors, Inc. ONLY (Jack C. Henning)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Court Finding (CV); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group, Inc.; Aramark Services, Inc.; Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC; Awarded Against: Esquivel, Leonicio; Cervantes, Maria Alejo; Comment: Plt's Leonicio Esquivel & Maria Alejo Cervantes shall take nothing by way of their complaint aganist Aramark Uniform & Career Appeal, Inc ,; Party: Names: Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group, Inc.; Aramark Services, Inc.; Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Reserved: Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: by Def. Aramark Corporation, Aramark Services, Inc and Aramark Uniform & Career Pparel Group, Inc. (Zachary Shine) 415-442-1163; 4/8/19rb *Rescheduled from 7/11/19 per 6/06/19 Ex Parte Order*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Hearing: Pro Hac Vice Counsel - Original Type: Hearing: Pro Hac Vice Counsel; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Atty VP DePillis by Defendants Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel Group, Inc., Aramark Services, Inc., and Aramark Uniform & Carreer Apparel, LLC(Jason Mills)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Order After Hearing - POS - Comment: Granting Application of VP Depillis to Appear Pro Hac Vice- Signed by Judge Arand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Order: Ex Parte - Comment: re: ex parte application to continue MSJ - GRANTED. The MSJ shall be continued from July 11, 2019 to September 10, 2019 9:00am dept.9. CMC is set for 10-1-19 10:00am - signed by Judge Arand

    Read MoreRead Less
191 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fees deposited for both plts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less