This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 15:24:15 (UTC).

Lensa Stanford vs Steve Chilton et al.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2016 Lensa Stanford filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Steve Chilton. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Folan, Maureen A, Strickland, Elizabeth, Kirwan, Peter and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1066

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

Stanford, Lensa Acevedo

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Salazar, Noemi

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Chilton, Steve Michael

Chilton, Charles

Perfect Shine Housekeeping

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Perfect Shine Housekeeping

Not Classified By Court

Neutral Amy Richelle Carlson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hibbard, Noel D

Hibbard, Noel D.

Alston, Catherine B.

Shin, Andrew Bo-Kyun

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Bellotti, Jerome P

Bellotti, Jerome P.

Polito, Dominic Martin

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Polito, Dominic Martin

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Carlson, Amy Richelle

Interested Party Attorney

Choi, Young Woo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Other ADR (CV); Party: Names: Stanford, Lensa Acevedo; Chilton, Steve Michael; Chilton, Charles; Perfect Shine Housekeeping; Neutral Amy Richelle Carlson; Comment: entire action with prejudice by atty HIbbard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Other ADR (CV); Party: Name: Comment: Partial w/ Prejudice as to Plt Noemi Salazar Only (Andrew B. Shin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: *continued from 07/19/18*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire action with prejudice by atty HIbbard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Partial, With Prejudice, as to the Claim of Plt State Compensation Insurance Fund ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Demand: Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less