This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 03:51:50 (UTC).

Lemon, Inc., Et Al V. Casares, Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2014 Lemon, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Casares. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter, Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8767

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Lemon, Inc.

Lemon Argentina, S.R.L.

LifeLock, Inc.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Wenceslao Casares

Federico Murrone

Fabian Cuesta

Martin Apesteguia

Cynthia Mcadam

Murrone, Federico

Apesteguia, Martin

Cuesta, Fabian

Casares, Wenceslao

McAdam, Cynthia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Norris, Austin C

Kirkland & Ellis Llp

333 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Torres, Diana M

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Matheson, Briggs

Berkowitz, Benjamin

Ragland, Steven P.

Keker & Van Nest LLP

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal

Request for Dismissal (STATE) [FINAL].pdf: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice of Entire Action

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • Remittitur - Comment: RESPONDENT TO RECOVER COSTS. PURSUANT TO THE REQUEST OF THE APPELLANT, THE APPEAL FILED ON FEBRUARY 26, 2016, IS DISMISSED. THE REMITTITUR SHALL ISSUE FORTHWITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (STATE) [FINAL].pdf: Comment: Dismissal With Prejudice of Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Notice: Prepare Reporter Transcrpt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • Motion: Compel - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Motion by Lemon, Inc. and Lemon Argentina S.R.L. to Compel Further Responses to Subpoena to Non-Party Xapo, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Waiver from Reporter - Comment: FROM MELISSA CRAWFORD #12288 PAID BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Waiver from Reporter - Comment: FROM MELISSA CRAWFORD #12288 PAID BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • Designation - Comment: #G-81549 / Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Reserved - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (1) Demurrer to Defendant Casares' First Amended Cross-Complaint and (2) Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • Deposit: Clerk's Transcript - Comment: #G-81285 *taken with ntc of appeal*

    Read MoreRead Less
186 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2014
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = $1,435.00 paid by def Cynthia McAdam. Taken on ntc of undocumented action. Legacy Name = CV Complex First Paper Decision = M Closed = 09/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2014
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = $1,435.00 paid by def Wenceslao Casares. Taken on ntc of undocumented action. Legacy Name = CV Complex First Paper Decision = M Closed = 09/19/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • Response/Reply - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = To Plts' Objection to Defs' Counter Designation of Case as Complex (Steven Ragland) Legacy Name = CV Response Decision = M Closed = 09/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Opposition/Objections - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = To defs' counter designation of case as complex. Atty Torres. Legacy Name = CV Objection... Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = 8,9,10,11 Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional Decision = M Closed = 08/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 08/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • Complaint: Amended - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 08/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 08/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 08/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 08/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less