Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:43:03 (UTC).

LEGALFORCE RAPC WORLDWIDE, P.C. et al vs Elizabeth Oliner et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 LEGALFORCE RAPC WORLDWIDE, P C filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Elizabeth Oliner. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Arand, Mary E, Zayner, Theodore C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2509

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

Zayner, Theodore C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abyanker, Raj V.

Defendants

Mandyam, Harish

Green, Desarie

Obidinski, Mary

Engle, Alan

Cyrus, Ashkon

Koneru, Sunita

Wiener, Seth

Talbot, Ashley

Raffel, Elan

Garber, Joshua

Park, Neil Dowon

Lachman, Andrew

Manriquez, Johnny

Bodniowycz, Larissa

Blomgren, Dan

Meador, Ross

Cheng, Julia

Onken, Jesko

Benito, Patrick

18 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abhyanker, Raj Vasant

Defendant Attorneys

Agnolucci, Simona Alessandra

Skaggs, Jason Marshall

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: re: Status of Federal Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 2nd CMC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal CIV-110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Hearing: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Motion to Quash Service of Summons by Defs Patrick Benito and Justin Sobodash (Atty Abraham Fine) an 11/26/18 *Set per Court Order*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Old: Agnolucci New: Skaggs/Faucette

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Motion: Sanctions - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Motion for Sanctions by All Def (Jeffelyn Friley)

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Kalyan Pokala

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Joshua Garber

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Chad Starkey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Edward Robinson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Laura Drossman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less