This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:28:45 (UTC).

Laurie Duong vs Mark Duong

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Laurie Duong filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Mark Duong. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayashi, Roberta S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0157

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Hayashi, Roberta S

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Duong, Laurie Ngoc

Luong, Anh Ngoc

Respondent

Duong, Mark Khanh

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Duong, Laurie Ngoc; Duong, Mark Khanh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 2-22-2019. Granted. Sent to the Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Shared residence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Group Status Conference Calendar - Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Set for Default - LM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: amended (p) separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less