This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 15:00:21 (UTC).

Laura Lucatero vs Peter Vesanovic et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Laura Lucatero filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Peter Vesanovic. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7864

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Lucatero

Defendants

Peter Vesanovic

Sarita Turley

Baudelio Aguilera

Total Quality Maintenance, Inc.

1-20 Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cary Seth Kletter

Defendant Attorney

Ernest Michael Malaspina

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

3/7/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

3/7/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Stipulation and Order

12/19/2022 Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

9/21/2022 Minute Order

Notice: Reassignment of Case

9/16/2022 Notice: Reassignment of Case

Notice: Reassignment of Case

9/16/2022 Notice: Reassignment of Case

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/7/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service

9/6/2022 Proof of Service

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/6/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/25/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Opposition/Objections

7/12/2022 Opposition/Objections

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/27/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/16/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/8/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

6/8/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/28/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/28/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 10; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Peter Vesanovic, Sarita Turley, Baudelio Aguilera, Total Quality Maintenance, Inc.,; Comment: Stipulation and Protective Order is GRANTED, signed Judge Kirwan [Env# 10738497]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 20; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Reassignment of Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Peter Vesanovic, Sarita Turley, Baudelio Aguilera, Total Quality Maintenance, Inc.,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Laura Lucatero,; Comment: Proof of Service (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Laura Lucatero,; Comment: Case Management Statement (Statements)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Peter Vesanovic, Sarita Turley, Baudelio Aguilera, Total Quality Maintenance, Inc.,; Comment: to complaint: atty Malaspina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Filed By: Laura Lucatero,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Laura Lucatero,; Comment: Proof of Service (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Laura Lucatero,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Laura Lucatero,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Laura Lucatero,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint (Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Laura Lucatero,; Comment: Complaint (Case Initiation)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Laura Lucatero,; Comment: Summons (Summons)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Laura Lucatero,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet (Comment)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MALASPINA, ERNEST M