Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 09:34:53 (UTC).

LaShonda White vs Sushyan Lin

Case Summary

On 08/31/2016 LaShonda White filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Sushyan Lin. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Borovoy, Roger and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5964

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Borovoy, Roger

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

White, LaShonda

Defendant

Lin, Sushyan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: White, LaShonda; Awarded Against: Lin, Sushyan; Amount; Damages: $3,801.08; Costs: $50.00; Total: $3851.08; Comment: *Amended on 6/15/17 to correct judgment date to 1/18/17--Amended Judg't Notice mailed to parties on 6/15/17.* Judg't Notice mailed to parties on 5/25/17.; Party: Names: White, LaShonda; Lin, Sushyan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: White, LaShonda; Awarded Against: Lin, Sushyan; Amount; Damages: $3,801.08; Costs: $50.00; Total: $3851.08; Comment: Judg't Notice mailed to parties on 5/25/17.; Party: Names: White, LaShonda; Lin, Sushyan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Judgment: Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: This matter ordered in court to reset/reserve.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Comment: Mailed 5/25/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: to a second address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Declaration: Non-Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Affidavit - Comment: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less