This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 10:30:09 (UTC).

Lark Industries, Inc. vs Sun Lakes Construction Company of California

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 Lark Industries, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sun Lakes Construction Company of California. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C, Takaichi, Drew C and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9813

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Takaichi, Drew C

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

Residential Design Services

Lark Industries, Inc.

LARK

Sun Lakes Construction of California

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Sun Lakes Construction of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Plumtree, A. Maria

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Leonidou, Janette George

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Other ADR (CV); Party: Names: Lark Industries, Inc.; Sun Lakes Construction of California; LARK; Comment: w/prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: unconditional

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Review: Mediation Status - Original Type: Review: Mediation Status; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: continued from 02/15/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice: Settlement (Settlements)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Takaichi, Drew C; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2017
  • Answer/Response (No Fee) - Comment: Answer to x-complt.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 4:00 PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Atty Kaufman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Cross-Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • General Denial: Unlimited

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less