This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 22:56:56 (UTC).

Lagoua Ripley vs Selina Cassiano

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Lagoua Ripley filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Selina Cassiano. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8719

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lagoua Ripley

Defendant

Selina Cassiano

 

Court Documents

Order: Restraining Order After Hearing

6/4/2019 Order: Restraining Order After Hearing

Minute Order

6/4/2019 Minute Order

Minute Order

5/29/2019 Minute Order

Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance

5/29/2019 Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance

Declaration: Non-Service

5/22/2019 Declaration: Non-Service

Declaration: Re: Diligence

5/22/2019 Declaration: Re: Diligence

Request to Continue/Reissue TRO HR

5/21/2019 Request to Continue/Reissue TRO HR

Minute Order

5/21/2019 Minute Order

Response: Petition Civil Harassment/Workplace Violence

5/13/2019 Response: Petition Civil Harassment/Workplace Violence

Order: Temporary Restraining Order

5/2/2019 Order: Temporary Restraining Order

Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

5/2/2019 Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

Request: Restraining Order

4/30/2019 Request: Restraining Order

Declaration: In Support

4/30/2019 Declaration: In Support

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/30/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Other; Department: Department 73; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Restraining Order After Hearing; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Other; Department: Department 73; Time: 8:15AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: New Hearing Date & Order on Reissuance; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Non-Service; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 73; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request to Continue/Reissue TRO HR; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,; Comment: c/f 5/21/19 to 5/29/19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response: Petition Civil Harassment/Workplace Violence; Filed By: Selina Cassiano,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Temporary Restraining Order; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,; Comment: GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Restraining Order; Filed By: Lagoua Ripley,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less