This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 14:42:09 (UTC).

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC. vs MTD DRYWALL, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 L A COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MTD DRYWALL, INC . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9121

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.

Defendants

LEGOLAND DISCOVERY CENTER SAN JOSE LLC,

MILPITAS MILLS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC.

MTD DRYWALL, INC.,

MERLIN ENTERTAINMENTS GROUP U.S. HOLDINGS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hamilton, Carol Ruth

Carol Ruth Hamilton

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs

11/24/2021 Memorandum of Costs

Judgment: Default

5/13/2021 Judgment: Default

Declaration: In Support

10/23/2020 Declaration: In Support

Declaration: In Support

10/23/2020 Declaration: In Support

Request: Dismissal

10/23/2020 Request: Dismissal

Declaration: In Support

10/23/2020 Declaration: In Support

Declaration: In Support

10/23/2020 Declaration: In Support

Default Entered

10/23/2020 Default Entered

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

9/2/2020 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Request: Dismissal

8/31/2020 Request: Dismissal

Request: Dismissal

8/31/2020 Request: Dismissal

Notice: Lis Pendens

8/19/2020 Notice: Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2020 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

8/5/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

8/5/2020 Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,; Comment: Los Angeles, $1,576.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Default; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., MTD DRYWALL, INC.,,; Comment: $1,458.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Entered; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., MTD DRYWALL, INC.,,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,; Comment: DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,; Comment: Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,; Comment: Partial Dismissal as to Fourth Casue of Action ONLY. Atty. Carol R. Hamilton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,; Comment: PARTIAL Dismissal as to Milpitas Mills Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group, Legoland Discovery Center San Jose LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group ONLY. Atty. Carol R. Hamilton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Lis Pendens; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC.,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MTD Drywall, Inc. a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Merlin Entertainments Group US Holding Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where MILPITALS MILLS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP INC. A CORPORATION DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP is a litigant