This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/02/2022 at 14:22:16 (UTC).

L. Rogers vs 24 Hour Fitness, et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2014 L Rogers filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 24 Hour Fitness,. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5009

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynn Rogers

Defendants

24 Hour Fitness

24 Hour Fitness Usa, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edward Francis Cullen

Defendant Attorney

Jack Clifford Nick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2015
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 9; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Lynn Rogers,; Comment: Text = Atty Richard Wilbur Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 08/25/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 9; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Heard: Continued (Event)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 9; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Vacated: settled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2015
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication; Department: Department 9; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Department: Department 9; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Heard: Continued (Event)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • HearingDescription: Motion: Compel Answers; Department: Department 9; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Off Calendar (before hearing)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2015
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Lynn Rogers,; Comment: Text = Atty Edward Cullen Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Settlement Decision = M Closed = 03/18/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketDescription: Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day; Filed By: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Text = Taken on ntc of undocumented action. Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 13; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Set for: further CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Text = posting of jury fees Legacy Name = CV Ntc of... Decision = M Closed = 08/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: Jury Fee Deposit; Filed By: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Text = $150 jury deposit by def 24 Hr Fit USA, Inc. Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 08/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • DocketDescription: Court Reporter Per Diem Fees - Half Day; Filed By: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Text = re: Ntc. Mtn. to Strike, 8/14/14, 9am, D9 Legacy Name = CV Court Reporter Fee < 1 Hour Decision = M Closed = 07/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketDescription: Motion: Strike; Filed By: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Text = memo of p's and a's; Atty Nick 8/14/14 @ 9:00am D-9 $30.00 court reporter fee due Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Mtn to Strike Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Text = $30.00 court reporter fee due Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Lynn Rogers, 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Text = Atty Nick Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 07/02/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Lynn Rogers, 24 Hour Fitness, 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Lynn Rogers, 24 Hour Fitness, 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Lynn Rogers, 24 Hour Fitness, 24 Hour Fitness USA, Inc.,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less