Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/04/2018 at 20:17:39 (UTC).

L. MacKay vs D. Jones

Case Summary

On 10/01/2007 L MacKay filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against D Jones. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L and Triplett, John R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4787

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Triplett, John R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda J MacKay

San Jose, CA 95122

MacKay, Linda J

Defendants

Darryl S Jones

Palo Alto, CA 94306-4709

Jones, Darryl S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2008
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Jones, Darryl S; Party: Name: MacKay, Linda J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Jones, Darryl S; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: MacKay, Linda J; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: MacKay, Linda J; Judgment Amount: $2,355.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Jones, Darryl S; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $105.00; Other: $2,250.00; Total: $2355.00; Comment: printdate=Jan 15 2008; freetext=payments are to be made @ the rate of $250.00 per month beginning on 2/8/08 (5 day grace period). and the 8th day of each month thereafter until paid in full. if any payment is missed, the entire balance may become due immdetiately.; origjudgdate=Jan 14 2008; judgstatusdate=Jan 15 2008; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2007
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Jones, Darryl S; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: MacKay, Linda J; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Acknowledge Satisfaction of Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2008
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Vacated; date advanced; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 03/20/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 01/14/2008

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2007
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Resched SC Trial Decision = M Closed = 12/18/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2007
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of Resched SC Trial Decision = M Closed = 12/18/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2007
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 12/14/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2007
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Triplett, John R; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JRT - Triplett, John Result Date = 11/15/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2007
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2007
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 10/01/2007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2007
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 11/28/2007

    Read MoreRead Less