This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 17:00:44 (UTC).

L. Guerra vs Maxrun Corp.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2011 L Guerra filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Maxrun Corp. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Persky, Aaron and Baum, Gary. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2936

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Persky, Aaron

Baum, Gary

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Linda Guerra

San Jose, CA 95123

Guerra, Linda

Defendants

Maxrun Corp.

C/O Aamco, 75 South Capitol Av

San Jose, CA 95127

AAMCO Transmission

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Maxrun Corp.; Party: Name: Guerra, Linda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Persky, Aaron; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Maxrun Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Guerra, Linda; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: Maxrun Corp.; Awarded Against: Guerra, Linda; Comment: printdate=Sep 7 2011; freetext=Judgment is for the DEFENDANT. Judge Persky; origjudgdate=Aug 30 2011; judgstatusdate=Sep 7 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Baum, Gary; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Maxrun Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Guerra, Linda; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Guerra, Linda; Judgment Amount: $2,857.57; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Maxrun Corp.; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $100.00; Other: $2,757.57; Total: $2857.57; Comment: clerkid=627; printdate=Jun 28 2011; freetext=Total judgment amount $2,857.87; origjudgdate=Jun 17 2011; judgstatusdate=Jun 28 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Maxrun Corp.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Guerra, Linda; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = with notice returned to small claims court Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 09/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2011
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: L. Guerra vs Maxrun Corp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2011
  • Order: Submitted Matter - Judicial Officer: Persky, Aaron; Comment: Text = Judgment for the DEFENDANT. Judge Persky Legacy Name = Order on Submitted Matter Decision = M Closed = 09/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2011
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Persky, Aaron; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Heard: Taken Under Submission; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = AP - Persky, Aaron Result Date = 08/26/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Subpoena Duces Tecum Decision = M Closed = 08/23/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2011
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc of Subpoena Decision = M Closed = 08/30/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2011
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = pos on Amended sc-100, NTL Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc by Mail Decision = M Closed = 06/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = pos on Amended sc-100, NTL Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc by Sub Service Decision = M Closed = 06/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2011
  • Defendant's Claim (Amended) (No change in claim amount) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Amended Claim (no fee) Decision = M Closed = 05/19/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = cont'd to 6/17/11 pursuant to mediation Result By = C Result Judge = JB1 - Bradley, John Result Date = 05/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = for the president to appear on behalf of a corporation Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = pos on sc-100, NTL Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc by Mail Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2011
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = pos on sc-100, NTL Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc by Sub Service Decision = M Closed = 04/08/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Vacated; reset; Comment: Result By = P Result Date = 03/01/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 01/26/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 01/26/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AAMCO TRANSMISSIONS, INC. is a litigant