This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 19:47:13 (UTC).

L. Fujitani vs E. Seiler, et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2014 L Fujitani filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against E Seiler. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, Folan, Maureen A and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4907

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lloyd Fujitani

Fujitani, Lloyd

Defendants

Treasure Chest Enterprises, Llc

Financial Review Services, Llc

Reo Acquisitions Partners, Llc

Jack B. Wolfe

Jack B. Wolfe, Llc

Huntcon, Inc.

Neil Lund

Just Homes, Llc

John Shekerjian

Title Connect, Llc

Edward A. Seiler

Lund, Neil

Seiler, Edward A.

Shekerjian, John

Wolfe, Jack B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven R. Levy

17670 Woodland Avenue

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Levy, Steven R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Lund, Neil; Party: Name: Huntcon, Inc.; Party: Name: Jack B. Wolfe, LLC; Party: Name: Wolfe, Jack B.; Party: Name: REO Acquisitions Partners, LLC; Party: Name: Financial Review Services, LLC; Party: Name: Treasure Chest Enterprises, LLC; Party: Name: Seiler, Edward A.; Party: Name: Fujitani, Lloyd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Title Connect, LLC; Party: Name: Shekerjian, John; Party: Name: Just Homes, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Text = *continued from 6-25-15* Result By = C Result Judge = MAF - Folan, Maureen Result Date = 07/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = (Steven Levy) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = (Steven Levy) Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 08/06/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Atty Steven Levy Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = Atty Steven Levy Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Heard: Continued (Event); Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = MAF - Folan, Maureen Result Date = 06/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 03/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less