This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 14:37:34 (UTC).

L. Brigham, et al vs D. Austin, et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2014 L Brigham filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against D Austin. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGowen, Beth, Folan, Maureen A, Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2290

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGowen, Beth

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Laurie Brigham

John Kessler

Mattson, Laurie

Lambie, Richard

Trf Jeffrey R Brigham 2001 Trust

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Derek L Austin

Law Office Of Derek L Austin

Adam W Ferguson

Pelosi & Ferguson, Llp

Austin, Derek L

Ferguson, Adam W

Mattson, Laurie

Lambie, Richard

Trf Jeffrey R Brigham 2001 Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Jesse F. Ruiz

227 North First Street, Suite 300

San Jose, CA 95113

Ruiz, Jesse F.

Hauser, Jerry R.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Austin, Derek L

Hauser, Jerry R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Name: Pelosi & Ferguson, LLP; Party: Name: Ferguson, Adam W; Party: Name: Law Office Of Derek L Austin; Party: Name: Austin, Derek L; Party: Name: Lambie, Richard; Party: Name: Mattson, Laurie; Party: Name: Mattson, Laurie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Original Type: Hearing: Dismissal after settlement; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated; dismissal filed; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 08/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 09/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = Complaint and X-Complaint Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 08/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard: Settled; Comment: Text = Continued from 7-28-15 *Last continuance* Mediator: Retired Judge Jamie Jacobs-May on 5-7-15, completed. Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 08/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Original Type: Conference: Trial Setting; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Heard: Continued (Event); Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 07/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = atty Ruiz Legacy Name = CV Case Mgmt Statement Decision = M Closed = 07/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2015
  • Review: Mediation Status - Original Type: Review: Mediation Status; Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Mediated: not settled; Comment: Text = *CourtCall: Contact: Jerry R. Hauser for Defendant(s), Pelosi Ferguson* Result By = C Result Judge = BM - McGowen, Beth Result Date = 05/14/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Notice of Hearing (no fee) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf Decision = M Closed = 02/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • Notice of Hearing (no fee) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = ARB-Ntc of Mediation Status Conf Decision = M Closed = 02/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Acknowledgement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Acknowledgement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Acknowledgement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • Acknowledgement - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Acknowledge Receipt Decision = M Closed = 06/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = For 1st amended complt. Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 05/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Complaint: Amended - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Text = Summons issued. Atty Ruiz. Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 05/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 03/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 03/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less