Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:38 (UTC).

Kris Juszczynski vs Ferrari North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Kris Juszczynski filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ferrari North America, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2484

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juszczynski, Kris

Defendant

Ferrari North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baker, Terry Lee

Defendant Attorney

Mohrman, Hannah Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Removal to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Under 28 USC 1441(a) Diversity

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: To complaint; Atty Mohman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ferrari North America, Inc. is a litigant