This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 17:39:00 (UTC).

Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation vs Roem Builders Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Knights Flooring, Inc , a California Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Roem Builders Incorporated. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1623

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Not Yet Classified

Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation

Roem Builders Incorporated

Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Roem Evelyn Avenue Family, LLC

PH Canyon Crest Holdings, LLC

Citibank NA,

Citigroup Corporate Holdings, Inc

Evelyn Avenue Family Apartments LP,

Citi Community Capital

Roem Builders Incorporated

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cosso, Dennis

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Dennis Cosso

Andrew Vinson Stearns

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

3/2/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

3/2/2021 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/22/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/22/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/22/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/22/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

9/22/2020 Conference: Further Case Management

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/24/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/24/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/16/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/16/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/16/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/16/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/16/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

8/16/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Minute Order

9/23/2020 Minute Order

Request: Dismissal

1/6/2021 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

3/2/2021 Minute Order

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 6; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,; Comment: Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: American Contractors Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, ROEM Builders Incorporated,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: American Contractors Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, ROEM Builders Incorporated,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,; Comment: re: Intent to Appear by Telephone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Knights Flooring, Inc., a California Corporation,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNIGHTS FLOORING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITIGROUP CORPORATE HOLDINGS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRAVELERS CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant