This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 19:41:18 (UTC).

Kirk Harter vs Rethana Harter

Case Summary

On 04/26/2017 Kirk Harter filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Rethana Harter. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayashi, Roberta S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1782

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Hayashi, Roberta S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Harter, Kirk Wayne

Claimant

CalPers

Respondent

Harter, Rethana Chiv

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Butler, David Alfred, Jr.

Respondent Attorney

Olson, Martha Johanna

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Harter, Kirk Wayne; Harter, Rethana Chiv; CalPers

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • Motion: Other (w/fee) - Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: **$30 reporter fee due prior to hrg** ; motion to be relieved as counsel -rlg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service: Mail; Notice of Motion and Motion to be Releived as Counsel; Dec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Order: Proposed - Comment: Motion: to be relieved as counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: atty's motion to be relieved as counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Motion: to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • Document: Other - Comment: Letter from CalPERS RE: Rethana Harter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Ex Parte Application - Restoration of Former Name after Jgmt - Comment: Rethanan Chiv Harter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Butler 5/8 by agreement.-lv

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: depo subpoena for the produc of business records w/ attachment; notice to consumer; affidavit of custodian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: depo subpoena for the produc of business records w/ attachment; notice to consumer; affidavit of custodian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: resp dec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Response: Dissolution - Comment: Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: Summons; Petition; Family Law Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Order: Publication or Posting - Comment: Denied for Publishing & Posting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • Application and Order - Comment: for Publication or Posting of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.