Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 16:36:09 (UTC).

Kirandeep Rapal and Kamal P. Rapal

Case Summary

On 07/06/2011 Kirandeep Rapal and Kamal P Rapal was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernardini, Susan and Lucero, Katherine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1014

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bernardini, Susan

Lucero, Katherine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kirandeep Rapal

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Petitioner

Rapal, Kirandeep

Defendant

Kamal Paul Rapal

Respondent

Rapal, Kamal Paul

Minors

Rapal, Jamie

Rapal, Shawn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2012
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Rapal, Jamie; Party: Name: Rapal, Shawn; Party: Name: Rapal, Kamal Paul; Party: Name: Rapal, Kirandeep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Lucero, Katherine; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Vacated: Judgment entered prior to CMC; Comment: Text = pet filed 7-6-11-do, c/f 1-10-12 per Order to change CMC gj.; c/f 7-10-12 per order filed 6-26-12..sb Result By = C Result Judge = KL - Lucero, Katherine Result Date = 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Kirandeep Rapal and Kamal P. Rapal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) - Judicial Officer: Lucero, Katherine; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Declaration: Default Judgment/Uncontested - Judicial Officer: Lucero, Katherine; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default Jgmt/Uncontested Decision = M Closed = 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) - Judicial Officer: Lucero, Katherine; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) - Judicial Officer: Lucero, Katherine; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver - Judicial Officer: Lucero, Katherine; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Appear/Stip/Waiver Decision = M Closed = 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2012
  • Judgment: Dissolution/Default - Judicial Officer: Lucero, Katherine; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/Default Decision = M Closed = 07/20/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Lucero, Katherine; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = pet filed 7-6-11-do, c/f 1-10-12 per Order to change CMC gj. Result By = C Result Judge = KL - Lucero, Katherine Result Date = 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2012
  • Stipulation and Order - Judicial Officer: Lucero, Katherine; Comment: Text = re: appointing Judge Pro Tem for Limited Purpose. Legacy Name = FL Stip and Order Decision = M Closed = 02/02/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2012
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = pet filed 7-6-11-do Result By = C Result Judge = SB3 - Bernardini, Susan Result Date = 01/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • Notice: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 01/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Req&Ord:Change Case Mgmt Conf Date Decision = G Closed = 01/03/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/27/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • Notice: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Case Management Conf Decision = M Closed = 07/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less