This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/03/2022 at 00:14:25 (UTC).

Kimberly Wittmers vs Brian White

Case Summary

On 05/06/2014 Kimberly Wittmers filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Brian White. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2459

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kimberly M. Wittmers

Respondent

Brian J. White

Minors

Andrew White

Ashlyn White

Katelyn White

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Findings & Order After Hearing; Filed By: Kimberly Wittmers,; Comment: heard on 1/5/21; change of venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Other w/fee; Department: Department 78; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Other w/fee; Department: Department 78; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Brian White,; Comment: Proof of Service by Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Kimberly Wittmers,; Comment: re: FL334

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order; Filed By: Brian White,; Comment: FL-320 - responsive declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies); Filed By: Kimberly Wittmers,; Comment: (p) mod other: Move case to El Dorado County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Mod Custody/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Mod Custody/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Response: Dissolution; Filed By: Brian White,; Comment: Text = ds Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Brian White,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Status Conference; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 06/17/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Kimberly Wittmers,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/23/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution w/minor; Filed By: Kimberly Wittmers,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Kimberly Wittmers,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA; Filed By: Kimberly Wittmers,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Kimberly Wittmers,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 05/06/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketDescription: Miscellaneous: Converted Document; Comment: Kimberly M. White and Brian J. White

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less