This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/27/2020 at 04:43:24 (UTC).

Almahdi v. Vitamin Shoppe Industries Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/11/2020 Almahdi filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Vitamin Shoppe Industries Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie and Lucas, Patricia M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5150

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Lucas, Patricia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Almahdi, Khozama

Defendant

Vitamin Shoppe Industries Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Blumenthal, Norman B

Defendant Attorney

Nadeau, Elisa Rene

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service: Electronic

Proof of Service: Electronic:

Notice

Notice Counter-Designation by Defendant Vitamin Shoppe Industries, Inc.: Comment: Notice of Counter-Designation as Complex

Notice

Notice CMC reset to 4-21-21: Comment: CMC reset from 12/2/20 to 4/21/21

Proof of Service

Proof of Service: Comment: Proof of Service

Statement: Case Management Conference

Joint CMS HRG 12-2-20: Comment: Joint Case Management Conference Statement

Notice

Notice CMC reset to 12-2-20: Comment: CMC reset from 11/20/20 to 12/2/20

Notice

Notice CMC 11-20-20 at 10am D3 CourtCall: Comment: CMC set for 11/20/20 at 10am in D3 (CourtCall)

Minute Order

Minutes Non-Criminal:

Proof of Service

POS: Comment: Proof of Service

Statement: Case Management Conference

JCMS HRG 7-17-20: Comment: Joint Case Management Conference Statement

Order: Deeming Case Complex

Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline: Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML

Order

Order and Notice of Reassignment of Case D3 PML: Comment: Order & Notice of Reassignment of Case to D3, Hon. Patricia M. Lucas presiding, for all purposes - signed/Civil Supervising Judge BM

Proof of Service: Mail

Proof of Service: Mail:

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance: Comment: to Complain: atty Nadeau

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil):

Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Lawsuit Notice:

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet:

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Joint CMS HRG 12-2-20: Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 2:30 PM; Comment: (2nd CMC) Representative PAGA action. Discovery and responsive pleading deadline stayed, as of 6/1/20, when the case was deemed complex. Mediation 3/4/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC reset to 4-21-21: Comment: CMC reset from 12/2/20 to 4/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Proof of Service: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Joint CMS HRG 12-2-20: Comment: Joint Case Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC reset to 12-2-20: Comment: CMC reset from 11/20/20 to 12/2/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice CMC 11-20-20 at 10am D3 CourtCall: Comment: CMC set for 11/20/20 at 10am in D3 (CourtCall)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConference: Case Management - JCMS HRG 7-17-20: Minutes Non-Criminal: Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: (1st CMC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order - Minutes Non-Criminal:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - POS: Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Electronic - Proof of Service: Electronic:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Notice Counter-Designation by Defendant Vitamin Shoppe Industries, Inc.: Comment: Notice of Counter-Designation as Complex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Mail - Proof of Service: Mail:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance: Comment: to Complain: atty Nadeau

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketClerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Env. #4230193, The defendant's name is inconsistent. Court records states that the defendant's name is "Vitamin Shoppe Industries Inc." Please see highlighted area.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Lawsuit Notice - Civil Lawsuit Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Summons:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies):

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vitamin Shoppe, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant