Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 07/21/2020 at 03:19:36 (UTC).

Kevin Jones et al vs JW Design Group

Case Summary

On 06/07/2019 Kevin Jones filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JW Design Group. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie, Arand, Mary E and Folan, Maureen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9803

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Arand, Mary E

Folan, Maureen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jones, Nao

Jones, Kevin

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JW Design Group

Wholesale Window Company

Martins Plastering, Inc.

Lopez, Juan Carlos

Milgard Manufacturing, Incorporated

MTM Building Group

Whitney, Jerry L.

MTM Building Group, Inc

Roes 1 through 100

P & B Plumbing, Inc.

J.W. Design & Construction, Inc

Advanced Wholesale Inc.

ATM Electric Inc.

Nor-Cal Insulation, Inc

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Wholesale Window Company

South Bay Windows

MTM Building Group, Inc

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisenhelder, Greg E

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Lorber, Bruce Wallace

Welch, Stephen Brendan

Acree, Marissa Nicole

Meyer, Raymond, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: **c/f 03/03/20**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketConference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Managemetn Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 3/3 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketStatement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketDefault Entered - Comment: Default of defendant JW Design Group. BASIC : e-served 2/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer/Response (No Fee) - Comment: to Cross Complaint of MTM Building Group Inc : Atty Welch

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint - Comment: Cross Action/Cross Complaint (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Milgard Manufacturing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACREE, MARISSA N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELCH, STEPHEN B.