This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:20 (UTC).

Kenneth Corby vs Kent Arai et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Kenneth Corby filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kent Arai. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6078

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Corby, Kenneth

Claimants

XL Insurance America, Inc.

XL Insurance America, Inc

Administered by Sedgwick CMS

Defendants

Arai, Yoshiaki

Arai, Kent

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Strouss, John P, III

Claimant Attorney

Turchin, Aaron Sholem

Defendant Attorney

Glaspy, Mary Kathleen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer/Response/Denial/Demurrer - First Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Notice: Lien Claimant - Comment: Lien in the amount of: $32,300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less