This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 09/04/2022 at 18:08:26 (UTC).

Kennedy v. Troon Golf, LLC, et al. (PAGA)

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 Kennedy filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Troon Golf, LLC, PAGA. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0007

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taylor Kennedy

Defendants

Troon Golf, LLC

Indigo Sports, LLC

OB Sports Golf Management, LLC

Troon Restaurant Holdings, LLC

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/6/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/6/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order: Deeming Case Complex

7/11/2022 Order: Deeming Case Complex

Civil Lawsuit Notice

7/11/2022 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/7/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Acknowledgement/Receipt

7/27/2022 Acknowledgement/Receipt

Notice

7/29/2022 Notice

Statement: Case Management Conference

8/26/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 3; Time: 2:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Taylor Kennedy,; Comment: HRG - 8/31/2022 - JOINT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Comment: CMC reset from 11/16/22 to 11/23/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Taylor Kennedy,; Comment: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: 1st CMC set for 11/16/22 at 2:30pm in D3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/PML

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Taylor Kennedy,; Comment: AMENDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Taylor Kennedy,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * PAGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Taylor Kennedy,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Taylor Kennedy,; Comment: PAGA Enforcement Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OB SPORTS GOLF MANAGEMENT (IRONWOOD) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TROON GOLF LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of California is a litigant