This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 07:02:11 (UTC).

Kelly Trom vs JKL Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 Kelly Trom filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JKL Corporation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Irene. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2446

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Irene

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trom, Kelly

Kelly Trom

Defendant

JKL Corporation

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

4/9/2020 Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice

Minute Order

3/5/2020 Minute Order

Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

3/4/2020 Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

3/4/2020 Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

Proof of Service: Substituted

2/5/2020 Proof of Service: Substituted

Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

2/3/2020 Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice; Filed By: Kelly Trom, JKL Corporation,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 14; Time: 8:30AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge; Filed By: Kelly Trom, JKL Corporation,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: JKL Corporation,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Substituted; Filed By: Kelly Trom,; Comment: Hrg: 03/04/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JKL, Inc. is a litigant