This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/01/2018 at 09:31:00 (UTC).

Keller Williams Realty Vs H. Roberts

Case Summary

On 06/30/2006 Keller Williams Realty filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against H Roberts. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ward, Gregory H and Cole, George. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3608

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ward, Gregory H

Cole, George

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keller Williams Realty

745 S. Bernardo Ave., #255D

Sunnyvale, CA 94087

Defendants

Heidi M. Roberts

Mountain View, CA 94043

Roberts, Heidi M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Roberts, Heidi M.; Party: Name: Keller Williams Realty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cole, George; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Roberts, Heidi M.; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Keller Williams Realty; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Keller Williams Realty; Judgment Amount: $5,085.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Roberts, Heidi M.; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $85.00; Other: $5,000.00; Total: $5085.00; Comment: printdate=Aug 7 2006; origjudgdate=Aug 7 2006; judgstatusdate=Aug 7 2006; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCCT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Roberts, Heidi M.; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Keller Williams Realty; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Ward, Gregory H; Comment: Text = with notice returned to small claims court. Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 09/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc:Transfer of SC Matter Decision = M Closed = 09/28/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • Trial De Novo - Original Type: Trial De Novo; Judicial Officer: Ward, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = GHW - Ward, Gregory Result Date = 09/19/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2006
  • Judgment - Judicial Officer: Ward, Gregory H; Comment: Text = Judgment for defendant. Plaintiff's exhibit returend by mail. Deft's exhibits remain in Dept.9 for pick up. Legacy Name = CV Judgment Decision = M Closed = 09/26/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2006
  • Clerk's Notice - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SCA-Ntc of SC Appeal Trial Decision = M Closed = 08/29/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • Notice: Appeal (Small Claims) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Ntc of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • Order - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Order of Court Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2006
  • Document: Other - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = letter from defendent. Legacy Name = SC Misc Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2006
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Cole, George; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = GC - Cole, George Result Date = 08/07/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2006
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 06/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Misc Declaration Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2006
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$5,001 to $10,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $5001-$7500 Decision = M Closed = 06/30/2006

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Keller Williams Realty, Inc. is a litigant