This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 05/12/2023 at 18:02:37 (UTC).

Kehoe v. DKD Property Management Company (Class Action)

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 Kehoe filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DKD Property Management Company Class Action. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2333

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bruce Kehoe

Defendant

DKD Property Management Company

Not Classified By Court

Superior Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Harmik Yeremian

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara

 

Court Documents

Civil Lawsuit Notice

3/13/2023 Civil Lawsuit Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2023 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

3/13/2023 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/13/2023 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Order: Deeming Case Complex

3/20/2023 Order: Deeming Case Complex

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 2:30PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Deeming Case Complex; Filed By: Superior Court of California,; Comment: Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/TCZ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Bruce Kehoe,; Comment: Class Action Complaint + Complex Fee paid by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Bruce Kehoe,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Bruce Kehoe,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet * Complex * Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Lawsuit Notice; Comment: Civil Lawsuit Notice 1st CMC set for 7/12/23 at 2:30pm in D19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less