This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:27 (UTC).

Katelyn Kraft vs Michael Kraft

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Katelyn Kraft filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Michael Kraft. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1271

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kraft, Katelyn Joy

Respondent

Kraft, Michael Albert

Minors

Kraft, Shane Ralphael

Kraft, Miraleigh Terisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Request: Enter Default - Comment: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: served: FL-100,..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration of Residence - Comment: (p)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less