Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 18:31:27 (UTC).

Karla Williams vs Keith Williams

Case Summary

On 04/13/2017 Karla Williams filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Keith Williams. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowen, Beth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1583

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McGowen, Beth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Williams, Karla E.

Respondent

Williams, Keith A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Moreno, Marilyn Edith

Lucarelli-Cowles, David B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Williams, Karla E.; Williams, Keith A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • Request for Order: Mod Spousal Support - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: (r) mod spousal support -rlg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: Appearance; stip and waiver fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2017
  • Request for Order: Mod Support - Original Type: Request for Order: Mod Support; Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (r) Mod Spousal or Partner Support; Atty Fees/Costs -NM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Comment: Income and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order - Comment: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order; HRG 6/7/17 1:30p

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • Request for Order (Modification) - Comment: (r) Mod Spousal or Partner Support; Atty Fees/Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lucarelli-Cowles, David B

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moreno, Marilyn Edith