This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:52:10 (UTC).

Kariann Riley vs Sean Riley

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Kariann Riley filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Sean Riley. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Huber, Joseph H., Arroyo, Jacqueline and Emede, Julie A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1341

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Huber, Joseph H.

Arroyo, Jacqueline

Emede, Julie A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Riley, Kariann

Respondent

Riley, Sean

Minor

Riley, Bria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Dugoni, Lisa M

Laughlin, Amy Anne

Respondent Attorneys

Tidalgo, Michelle Weber

Sukhodrev, Yanna

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Notice: Case Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney - Comment: Substitution of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Hearing: Review - Judicial Officer: Emede, Julie A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: set for review per 5/21/18 EMS order filed under Case No.: 18FL001341 & IDC of minor's counsel per D66 5/21/18 mins re: 18DV000226-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Statement - Comment: Petitioner's Update to Court in Advance of July 18, 2018 Review Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Document: Other - Comment: Update to Court re Respondent's Recent Abusive Conduct and Messages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Order: Emergency Screening - Comment: (P/R) FCS# 17FC00462-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Proof of Service: Electronic - Comment: update to court re: rsp recent abusive conduct & messages

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail - Comment: Respondent's Motion for Peremptory Challenge, Declaration of Michelle Tidalgo, Proposed Order Granting Respondent's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Declaration of Michelle Tidalgo in Support of Motion for Peremptory Challenge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PET - marriage FL; summs - FL; dec. UCCJEA; blank dec. UCCJEA; blank respon. - marriage forms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less