Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:39:53 (UTC).

Kari Bernardo vs Donald Bernardo

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Kari Bernardo filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Donald Bernardo. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2976

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bernardo, Kari

Respondent

Bernardo, Donald Nicholas K

Minor

Bernardo, Mia

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Bernardo, Kari; Bernardo, Donald Nicholas K; Bernardo, Mia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Stipulation: Temporary Judge/Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: by personal service re: petition,...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less