This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 17:00:30 (UTC).

Karen O'Hare vs LinkedIn Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2016 Karen O'Hare filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LinkedIn Corporation. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGowen, Beth, Elfving, William J, Stoelker, James L, Strickland, Elizabeth, Kulkarni, Sunil R, Zayner, Theodore C and Takaichi, Drew C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1808

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGowen, Beth

Elfving, William J

Stoelker, James L

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Zayner, Theodore C

Takaichi, Drew C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

O'Hare, Karen Frugoli

Claimant

American Casualty Company

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Not Classified By Court

LinkedIn Corporation

A&D Automatic Gate Company

KR555 Mathilda, LLC

Crown Energy Services, Inc

Cushman & Wakefield of California, Inc.

EMX Industries, Inc.

Able Engineering, Inc.

Doe 5

Doorking, Inc.

Able Engineering Services, Inc.

Miller Edge Inc.

Nortek Security & Control, LLC

Arc Tec, Inc.

Devcon Construction Incorporated

Devcon Construction, Inc.

Bon Appetit Management Co.

Devon Construction, Inc.

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

Cushman & Wakefield of California, Inc.

Nortek Security & Control, LLC

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosenberg, Mark D

Claimant Attorneys

Joseph, Mark Edwin

Luciano, Saerim

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Waite, James F.

Morrow, Kate

Hurley, Alison Kathleen

Lucey, Nathaniel R

Livingston, Renee Welze

Moriarty, Dennis F

Salah, Catherine Anne

Mijanovic, Krsto

Koenig, Randall F

Reynolds, Michael Rene

Meehan, John Robert

Hentschel, John C

Defendant, Not Classified By Court and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Lucey, Nathaniel R

Mijanovic, Krsto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Other ADR (CV); Party: Name: Comment: PARTIAL w/o prej as to the Complaint ONLY (Mark D. Rosenberg) *ncp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Moriarty as to cross complaint filed 11-30-16 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Notice - Comment: HRG 07-18-19 Notice of Continued Case Status Review Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Re: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Riddles as to cross complaint filed 9-8-16 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: partial with prejudice by atty Reynolds as to cross complaint filed by Devcon Construction 5-16-17 only

    Read MoreRead Less
416 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2016
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: atty:Waite

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to complaint Atty Waite

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee deposited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less