Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:45:48 (UTC).

Kambiz Hooshmand et al vs Michael Chacon et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 Kambiz Hooshmand filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael Chacon. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Stoelker, James L, Zayner, Theodore C and Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2235

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Stoelker, James L

Zayner, Theodore C

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hooshmand, Kambiz

Attarzadeh, Nazy

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Chacon, Michael Anthony

Michael Chacon dba MAC Architecture | Construction

Fleetwood Aluminum Products, Inc.

Rosa Construction & Drywall, Inc.

Soria Plastering Corp

Siega, McVey & Kriletich

Cross Defendants

Soria Plastering Corporation

DOE 1

Palo Alto Glass, Inc.

Market Engineering, Inc.

Landra Electric

Faraci House Painting

Nelson Castrillo Heating

JMR Builders, Inc.

Global Steel Fabricators, Inc.

Hylton Plumbing, Inc.

California Wood Floors

Special Master

Dekker, Peter H

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mackey, Scott Michael

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Kennedy, Kevin P

Dulik, Gregg Neal

Jones, Todd Alan

Burrow, Lance

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Burrow, Lance

Masoom, Elnaz

Miller, Kathleen Cheatum

Trevithick, Bruce Alan

McEneaney, Jennifer Elizabeth

Hill, John Torkel

Black, John Emmett

Shane, Jason B.

Other Attorneys

Dalmore, Jean Ann

Soble, Marc Steven

Scheley, Lloyd Theodore, III

Burke, Michael S.

Redfield, Charles Scranton

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • Notice - Comment: Notice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Notice: Association/Co-Counsel - Comment: Association of Attorney/Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Default Pending - Comment: as to Rosa Construction & Drywall, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Default Pending - Comment: as to Landra Electric

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Default Pending - Comment: as to Global Steel Fabricators, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
85 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Cross-Complaint - Comment: Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Opposition/Objections - Comment: Objection

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Demand: Jury Trial - Comment: Demand for Jury Trial and Notice of Advanced Payment of Jury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fleetwood Aluminum Products, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles S Redfield

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURKE, MICHAEL S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DALMORE JEAN A.