This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 04:43:59 (UTC).

K. Pesic vs Zouves Fertility Center, et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2014 K Pesic filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against Zouves Fertility Center. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L, McGowen, Beth, Zayner, Theodore C, Cabrinha, Neal A, Strickland, Elizabeth, Arand, Mary E, Pierce, Mark H and Huber, Joseph H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1935

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

McGowen, Beth

Zayner, Theodore C

Cabrinha, Neal A

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

Pierce, Mark H

Huber, Joseph H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

Katherine Pesic

Pesic, Katherine

Administrator Of The Estate Of Ivan Pesic

Defendants

Zouves Fertility Center

Shelley Tarnoff

Christo Zouves

Joyce Chin

Zouves, Christo

Tarnoff, Shelley

Zouves Fertility Center, A Medical Corporation

Zouves, Christo, MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Christine H. Long

1100

San Jose, CA 95113

Ehrlich, Mitchell Todd

Sherman, Kathleen Fitzgerald

Defendant Attorneys

Richards, Renee A.

Ward, Dennis J.

Gentile, Gregory M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2018
  • Motion: Strike - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: Portions of the First Amended Complaint by Def Christo Zouves M.D and Zouves Fertility Center (J Julie Hansen-Arenas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Hearing: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: to the First Amended Complaint by Def Christo Zouves M.D and Zouves Fertility Center (J Julie Hansen-Arenas)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Motion: Strike - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: the First Amended Complaint by Def Shelley Turnoff (Dennis Ward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Hearing: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: to the First Amended Complaint by Def Shelley Turnoff (Dennis Ward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Cont from 12/11/2017 per Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Answer: Cross Complaint - Comment: First Amended Cross Complaint Atty Ellenberg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: of J. Julia Hansen-Arenas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Demurrer - Comment: to First Amended Complaint, atty: Julia Hansen-Arenas. HD: 05/10/2018, 9AM, D6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: of J. Julia Hansen-Arenas

    Read MoreRead Less
218 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2015
  • Declaration: In Opposition - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Text = Opposition to OSC re: sanctions, 4/9/15 9am D-21, by atty Sherman. Legacy Name = CV Decl in Opposition Decision = M Closed = 03/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2015
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Huber, Joseph H.; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 03/09/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 4:00 PM; Result: Set for: OSC/Dismissal; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = ES8 - Strickland, Elizabeth Result Date = 02/17/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Assign to Department; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = MEA - Arand, Mary Result Date = 12/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 10/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 10/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 10/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less