This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/02/2022 at 15:06:32 (UTC).

K. Iu vs Roem Development Corp.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2014 K Iu filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Roem Development Corp. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L, Steingart, Lisa, Ellis, Terry and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6579

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Steingart, Lisa

Ellis, Terry

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kai Iu

Iu, Kai

Defendants

Roem Development Corp.

Rosemary Apartments

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2014
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 15; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Heard: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party; Filed By: Roem Development Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 07/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Substituted; Filed By: Kai Iu, Roem Development Corp.,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc by Sub Service Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • HearingDescription: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Department: Department 14; Time: 1:00PM; Result: Vacated; reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2014
  • DocketDescription: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003); Filed By: Kai Iu,; Comment: Text = Granted Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = G Closed = 05/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2014
  • DocketDescription: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: Kai Iu,; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 05/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • DocketDescription: Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003); Filed By: Kai Iu,; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = D Closed = 05/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less; Filed By: Kai Iu,; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 05/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2014
  • DocketDescription: Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001); Filed By: Kai Iu,; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 05/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roem Development Corporation is a litigant