This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:32:04 (UTC).

Judith Reel vs Ted Miljevich et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Judith Reel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ted Miljevich. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Arand, Mary E, Pierce, Mark H and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1868

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Arand, Mary E

Pierce, Mark H

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reel, Judith E.

Defendants

Tree Movers, Inc.

Miljevich, Ted

A-Z Nursery

Pacific Gas & Electric Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tambornini, Kyle Karl

Defendant Attorneys

Staples, William H.

Tappan, Kristie Allison

Damlos, Barbara Jean

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: Last Continuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: re: Bankruptcy as to Def PG&E only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Defs A-Z Nursery & Ted Miljevich only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee paid for plaintiff Judith E. Reel by Atty Tambornini (via E-file)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Tree Movers inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less