This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:35 (UTC).

Juanita Bracy vs Caron Bracy

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Juanita Bracy filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Caron Bracy. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Franco, Jose S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0162

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Franco, Jose S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bracy, Juanita Denae

Respondent

Bracy, Caron Lil Damon

Minor

Bracy, Naomi Carina

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Franco, Jose S; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Bracy, Juanita Denae; Bracy, Caron Lil Damon; Bracy, Naomi Carina

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Request for Order: Other w/fee - Judicial Officer: Franco, Jose S; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: (P)Vacate judgment entered 05/23/18 and dismiss entire action-ct

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Findings & Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) - Comment: -Vacate judgment entered 05/23/18 and dismiss entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Juanita 4/20 by agreement-MV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Group Status Conference Calendar - Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Set for Default - LM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: ptr- separate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: ptr- community

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less