Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 11/08/2019 at 12:57:27 (UTC).

Juan Ibarra vs Zina Littlejohn

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 Juan Ibarra filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Zina Littlejohn. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9954

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ibarra, Juan Andres

Claimant

State Compensation Insurance Fund

Defendant

Littlejohn, Zina Latanya

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peironnet, J William, IV

Claimant Attorney

Brown, Charles Henry, II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Ibarra, Juan Andres; Littlejohn, Zina Latanya; State Compensation Insurance Fund; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Peironnet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Peironnet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Notice: Lien Claimant - Comment: $20347.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Memorandum: Points and Authorities - Comment: for ex parte

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Order - Comment: re: extending time in which to serve summons and complaint : NO ADDTL continuances will be allowed. Granted and signed by Judge Pierce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Ex Parte Application - Comment: for extension of time to serve summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN CHARLES H. II ESQ