Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 05:54:28 (UTC).

Juan Bernal vs Alexandria Vargas

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 Juan Bernal filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Alexandria Vargas. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Mikkelsen, Laurie and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6592

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bernal, Juan

Defendant

Vargas, Alexandria

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Staskus, Kim D.

Defendant Attorney

Ruiz, Jesse F.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Judgment Type: Consolidated (CV, FL, MH, PR); Party: Names: Bernal, Juan; Vargas, Alexandria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: TO COMPLAINT : ATTY RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Notice: Related Cases - Comment: 18CV333968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Staskus, Kim D.