This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:54:03 (UTC).

Joyce Nicholas et al vs Green Waste Recovery, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2018 Joyce Nicholas filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Green Waste Recovery, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Zayner, Theodore C and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2580

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Zayner, Theodore C

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Irlanda, Kathryn L.

Nicholas, Paul L.

Lorey, Rosalind

Urban, Ruth A.

Nicholas, Andrew R.

Nicholas, Joyce L.

Defendants

Salazar, Gustavo H.

Green Waste Recovery, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Smith, William B.

Defendant Attorney

Yoshimura, Frances Hisako

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Other ADR (CV); Party: Names: Nicholas, Joyce L.; Nicholas, Andrew R.; Irlanda, Kathryn L.; Nicholas, Paul L.; Urban, Ruth A.; Lorey, Rosalind; Green Waste Recovery, Inc.; Salazar, Gustavo H.; Comment: w/prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: with prejudice by atty Waldsmith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Notice: Settlement - Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case - Uncondit'l (Smith)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Order - Comment: re: 6-5-18 motion to advance for an order establishing trial preference - GRANTED. Trial wil commence on 10-18-18 at 8:45am in dept.6. MSC set for 10-13-18 - signed by Judge Zayner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Original Type: Hearing: Motion hearings; Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Motion for Trial Preference by Plts Joyce Nicholas (William B. Smith)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: HRG 6/5/18 - Declaration of Non Opposition to Motion to Advance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Proof of Service: Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) - Comment: $150 jury fee paid for plaintiffs Joyce L. Nicholas, Andrew R. Nicholas, Kathryn L. Irlanda, Paul L Nicholas, Ruth A. Urban, Rosalinda Lorey by Atty Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Yoshimura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Gustavo H. Salazar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Green Waste Recovery, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Declaration: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less