Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 02:02:34 (UTC).

JOY GOSH vs SOMITA BASU

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 JOY GOSH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SOMITA BASU. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowen, Beth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2329

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McGowen, Beth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOSH, JOY

Respondent

BASU, SOMITA

Minors

GOSH, DHRUV

Gosh, Raj

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: GOSH, JOY; BASU, SOMITA; GOSH, DHRUV; Gosh, Raj

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record - Comment: Atty. Gloria Flores-Cerul-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Stipulation and Order - Comment: appointing temp judge for judicially supervised settlement conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Other - Comment: fl ntc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Enforcement Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less