This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 03:12:16 (UTC).

Joseph Mendoza vs Sutter's Place, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Joseph Mendoza filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sutter's Place, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0021

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mendoza, Joseph

Joseph Mendoza

Defendants

Sutter's Place, Inc.

Bay 101 Casino

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cowan, Kevin Michael

Kevin Michael Cowan

 

Court Documents

Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

5/27/2021 Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS

Request: Dismissal

3/13/2020 Request: Dismissal

Proof of Service

3/13/2020 Proof of Service

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/12/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/12/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/12/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS; Filed By: Sutter's Place, Inc., Bay 101 Casino,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service; Filed By: Joseph Mendoza,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Joseph Mendoza,; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Cowan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Joseph Mendoza,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Joseph Mendoza,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Joseph Mendoza,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sutter's Place, Inc. a California Corportion doing business as Bay 101 Casino is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COWAN, KEVIN M.