This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 15:06:42 (UTC).

Joseph Francesconi et al vs University Cafe et al

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 Joseph Francesconi filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against University Cafe. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGowen, Beth and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0944

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGowen, Beth

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Francesconi, Joseph

Francesconi, Laurel

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Dewing, Stephen

Dewing, Martha

University Cafe

Martha Dewing and Stephen Dewing, as Co-Trustees of the 1980 Dewing Trust Dated October 17,1980 and as subsequently amended, the 1980 Dewing Trust dated October 17, 1980 and as Subsequently Amended

Estate of Robert Louis Dewing, deceased

Thoits Bros., Inc.

University Cafe, Inc.

As Co-Executors of the Estate of Robert L Dewing

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Thoits Bros., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Staskus, Michael J.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Mcgarry, James J

Crosby, Matthew A.

Beatty, Thomas

Lauderdale, Andrew M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Beatty, Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Consolidated (CV, FL, MH, PR); Party: Names: Francesconi, Joseph; Francesconi, Laurel; Estate of Robert Louis Dewing, deceased; Thoits Bros., Inc.; University Cafe; University Cafe, Inc.; Dewing, Stephen; Dewing, Martha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Comment: Complaint w/out prej Only as to Martha Dewing and Stephen Dewing as Co-Trustees (atty: Michael J Staskus)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: cont. from 5-24-16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Answer/Response (No Fee) - Comment: Answer to x-complt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2016
  • Cross-Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: atty beatty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint Atty Lauderdale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: Taken on CMC statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Notice: Related Cases - Comment: 114cv270401

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less