Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:19:06 (UTC).

Joseph Chung vs Beshoff Infiniti et al

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 Joseph Chung filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Beshoff Infiniti. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6116

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chung, Joseph S

Defendants

Nissan North America

Beshoff Infiniti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abrams, Kathryn Beth

Defendant Attorney

Lecky, Paul Stuart

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Chung, Joseph S; Beshoff Infiniti; Nissan North America; Comment: With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Notice: Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: to Complaint; Atty Lecky

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less