Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:39:56 (UTC).

Jose Solis et al vs Alena Goeld

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Jose Solis filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Alena Goeld. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Stoelker, James L, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Williams, Benjamin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4990

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Stoelker, James L

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Williams, Benjamin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Huang, Chia-Ling

Solis, Jose L

Defendant

Goeld, Alena S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Williams, Benjamin; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Solis, Jose L; Huang, Chia-Ling; Awarded Against: Goeld, Alena S; Amount; Damages: $4,000.00; Costs: $50.00; Total: $4050.00; Comment: Judg't is joint and severally as to plts.; Party: Names: Solis, Jose L; Huang, Chia-Ling; Goeld, Alena S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: BW / OEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Warrant: Returned and Filed - Comment: with WP to Appear for hearing 2/11/19 8:30 AM Dept. 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: on BW / OEX Hrg: 2/11/19 8:30 AM Dept. 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Warrant: Issued - Comment: BW & $ 50.00 ck sent to Sheriff - Santa Clara Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: POS on: OEX. Hrg: 12/03/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Application: Order of Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Williams, Benjamin; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less