This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:30:33 (UTC).

Jose Flores vs Nhung Trieu et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Jose Flores filed an Other lawsuit against Nhung Trieu. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirwan, Peter and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1852

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kirwan, Peter

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Flores, Jose

Defendants

Trieu, Nhung

Le, Huong

Nhung, Trieu

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: re: Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Reserved: Demurrer - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Motion to Quash Service of Summons by Def Nhung Trieu (In Pro Per) 408-829-9993 rta 12-04-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion; Comment: No Special or Telephonic Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Conference: Trial Setting - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re; bankruptcy/default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Grant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less