This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 02:10:40 (UTC).

Jose Brasil vs George Karis

Case Summary

On 03/28/2017 Jose Brasil filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against George Karis. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Folan, Maureen A and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7954

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brasil, Jose D.

Hillside Drywall

Jose D. Brasil

Defendants

Karis Construction

Karis, George W.

George W. Karis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Delas, Anthony

Anthony Delas

 

Court Documents

Statement: Case Management Conference

10/11/2017 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

7/18/2017 Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Jose Brasil,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 8; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Jose Brasil,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: George Karis,; Comment: pro per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where dba Hillside Drywall is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Delas, Anthony