This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:13 (UTC).

Jorge Ayapan vs CRM Restaurant Group dba House of Meatball et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Jorge Ayapan filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CRM Restaurant Group dba House of Meatball. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6076

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ayapan, Jorge Luis

Defendants

CRM Restaurant Group dba House of Meatball

McQuaide, John

House of Meatball

CRM Restaurant Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Waelty, Joel P.

Defendant Attorney

Seibert, Kurt Jenal

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Further Case Management; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: HRG 12/18/18 Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: General Denial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: General Denial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint for Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less